KS HB2217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas thrift savings plan act.
Title
Enacting the Kansas thrift savings plan act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2019-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2019-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions |
2019-02-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2217/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2217_00_0000.pdf |