KS HB2216 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 15 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 15 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas money transmitter act.
Title
Kansas money transmitter act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 116 Nay: 4 (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 109 Nay: 12 (Y: 109 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 109 Nay: 12 (Y: 109 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 15 , 2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 10, 2015 |
2015-04-02 | House | House Reengrossed on Wednesday, April 01 , 2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 116 Nay: 4 |
2015-03-31 | House | House Representative Burroughs replaces Representative Frownfelter on the Conference Committee |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Bowers and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2015-03-30 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative DeGraaf , Representative Kelly and Representative Frownfelter as conferees |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Smith was adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Smith |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-02-25 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 109 Nay: 12 |
2015-02-25 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 24 , 2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions |
2015-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 10, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2015-02-03 | House | House Introduced |