KS HB2215 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing persons with felony drug convictions to receive benefits under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Allowing persons with felony drug convictions to receive benefits under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-03 | House | House Introduced |