KS HB2213 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that purchases of property and construction of buildings by townships are subject to protest petition and election procedure.
Title
Requiring that purchases of property and construction of buildings by townships are subject to protest petition and election procedure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2021-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-02-03 | House | House Introduced |