KS HB2212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Apportionment of corporate income under the multistate tax compact; election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apportionment of corporate income under the multistate tax compact; election.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2019-02-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-02-08HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback