KS HB2211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing judges to waive or reduce driver's license reinstatement fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing judges to waive or reduce driver's license reinstatement fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
2019-04-02HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-02-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback