KS HB2211 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing judges to waive or reduce driver's license reinstatement fees.
Title
Allowing judges to waive or reduce driver's license reinstatement fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-02-27 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 2 |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2019-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | House | House Introduced |