KS HB2210 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; political or temporary signs; city and county restrictions.
Title
Elections; political or temporary signs; city and county restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 100 Nay: 25 (Y: 100 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 100 Nay: 25 |
2017-02-23 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Cox was rejected |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Cox |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-02-03 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Elections; Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-31 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-01-31 | House | House Introduced |