KS HB2206 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Changing the bonding and cost requirements for animals taken into custody under a violation of cruelty to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the bonding and cost requirements for animals taken into custody under a violation of cruelty to animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-02-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback