KS HB2201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Updating statutory references necessitated by 2012 executive reorganization order no. 41 related to administration of tuberculosis programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating statutory references necessitated by 2012 executive reorganization order no. 41 related to administration of tuberculosis programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2019
2019-04-02HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-02-26SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-25SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-25HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: (proponents) Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback