KS HB2199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending documentation requirements related to preparation of dead bodies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending documentation requirements related to preparation of dead bodies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-02-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-20SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-20HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 1
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback