KS HB2198 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the use of expedited partner therapy to treat a sexually transmitted disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the use of expedited partner therapy to treat a sexually transmitted disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 89 Nay: 35 (Y: 89 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 89 Nay: 35
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2019-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2019-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback