KS HB2197 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amortizing the state and school KPERS actuarial accrued liability over a 30-year period and eliminating certain level-dollar employer contribution payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amortizing the state and school KPERS actuarial accrued liability over a 30-year period and eliminating certain level-dollar employer contribution payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed Yea: 36 Nay: 87
2019-02-14HouseHouse Representative Hawkins raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Neighbor
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Benson was rejected Yea: 48 Nay: 75
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Benson
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Pittman was rejected Yea: 49 Nay: 73
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Pittman
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee Report without recommendation by
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2019-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback