KS HB2197 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 16 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 16 April 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2197 by Committee on Education -- Kansas state high school activities association; membership of board of directors and executive board.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2197 by Committee on Education -- Kansas state high school activities association; membership of board of directors and executive board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 94 Nay: 30 (Y: 94 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 69 Nay: 53 (Y: 69 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 69 Nay: 53 (Y: 69 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 16 April 2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 08, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 94 Nay: 30 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Abrams, Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley appointed as conferees |
2014-03-31 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Brunk , Representative Couture-Lovelady and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 12 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-03-26 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 69 Nay: 53 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, 26 March 2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2013-02-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2013-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-01 | House | House Introduced |