KS HB2193 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Engrossed on Wednesday, 30 March 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Engrossed on Wednesday, 30 March 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2193 by Committee on Education -Providing authority for a school district to adopt a local activities budget.
Title
Substitute for HB 2193 by Committee on Education -Providing authority for a school district to adopt a local activities budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Substitute not passed - Yea: 56 Nay: 68 (Y: 56 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Substitute not passed - Yea: 56 Nay: 68 (Y: 56 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Substitute not passed - Yea: 56 Nay: 68 (Y: 56 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Engrossed on Wednesday, 30 March 2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Final Action - Substitute not passed; Yea: 56 Nay: 68 | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Otto | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Brookens | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Otto was rejected | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Otto | |
2011-03-29 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced |