KS HB2188 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring review by the joint committee on information technology of state agency contracts for certain information technology projects.
Title
Requiring review by the joint committee on information technology of state agency contracts for certain information technology projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2021-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | House | House Introduced |