KS HB2188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dissolving the White Clay watershed district no. 26, city of Atchison assumes obligations and amending the tax lid relating to the dissolution of any taxing subdivision.
Title
Dissolving the White Clay watershed district no. 26, city of Atchison assumes obligations and amending the tax lid relating to the dissolution of any taxing subdivision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-19 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Local Government |
2019-03-06 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-27 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N - CANCELED |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2019-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-07 | House | House Introduced |