KS HB2186 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing single sales factor apportionment of business income for certain taxpayers.
Title
Allowing single sales factor apportionment of business income for certain taxpayers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation |
2022-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 8, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 16, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-02-01 | House | House Introduced |