KS HB2184 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2184 by Committee on Commerce - Amending workers compensation death benefits.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2184 by Committee on Commerce - Amending workers compensation death benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 112 Nay: 11 (Y: 112 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 79 (Y: 45 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 112 Nay: 11 (Y: 112 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 79 (Y: 45 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Thursday, April 05, 2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Commerce |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-05-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 112 Nay: 11 |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Weber was rejected |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Weber |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whitmer was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 79 |
2017-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whitmer |
2017-05-02 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 17, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-02-07 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-01-26 | House | House Introduced |