KS HB2180 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the health maintenance organization privilege fee and extending the medical assistance fee fund.
Title
Increasing the health maintenance organization privilege fee and extending the medical assistance fee fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 103 Nay: 21 (Y: 103 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-04-06 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 103 Nay: 21 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Tarwater was rejected |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Tarwater |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | House Introduced |