KS HB2178 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 11, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Kansas underground utility damage prevention act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Kansas underground utility damage prevention act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 2 (Y: 122 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 11, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2019
2019-04-01HouseHouse Concurred with amendments; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
2019-03-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
2019-02-27HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-12HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 12, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2019-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback