KS HB2177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the dissolution of special districts and the assumption of responsibilities by a city or county.
Title
Providing for the dissolution of special districts and the assumption of responsibilities by a city or county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 3, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2021-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-28 | House | House Introduced |