KS HB2172 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Notice of the late filing of lobbyist reports and the grace period allowed start when the notice is mailed.
Title
Notice of the late filing of lobbyist reports and the grace period allowed start when the notice is mailed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Elections |
2019-02-21 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 21, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N |
2019-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2019-02-06 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2172/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2172_00_0000.pdf |