KS HB2168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the ad astra rural jobs act.
Title
Enacting the ad astra rural jobs act.
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Waymaster [R] | Sen. J.R. Claeys [R] | Rep. Susan Concannon [R] | Rep. Erin Davis [R] |
Rep. Kyle Hoffman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 97 Nay: 22 (Y: 97 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 56 Nay: 63 (Y: 56 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 56 Nay: 63 (Y: 56 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 06, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-03-15 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 97 Nay: 22 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 56 Nay: 63 |
2017-03-14 | House | House Representative Davis raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Davis was adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Davis |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-03-08 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-02-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 06, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 546-S |
2017-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-01-25 | House | House Introduced |