KS HB2167 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Reengrossed on Monday, April 8, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2167 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Establishing a commercial industrial hemp program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2167 by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Establishing a commercial industrial hemp program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 114 Nay: 3 (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 63 Nay: 60 (Y: 63 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse Reengrossed on Monday, April 8, 2019
2019-05-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2019
2019-05-01HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 114 Nay: 3
2019-04-05SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
2019-04-05SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-04-05SenateSenate Senator Billinger is appointed to replace Senator Estes on the Conference Committee
2019-04-02SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Kerschen, Senator Estes and Senator Francisco appointed as conferees
2019-04-02HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Highland , Representative Smith, E. and Representative Carlin as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kerschen was adopted
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kerschen
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: (opponents) Thursday, March 14, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: (neutral) Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
2019-03-06SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 63 Nay: 60
2019-02-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-06HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-06HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2167/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2167_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2167_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2167_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2167_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2167_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190227093448_184062/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190327165854_221658/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190405180055_409192/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190405181826_336296/

Bill Comments

feedback