KS HB2161 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State finances; requiring the KPERS board to liquidate the pooled money investment portfolio investment pursuant to K.S.A. 2016 Supp. 75-2263; transferring money to the state general fund and to the pooled money investment portfolio; authorizing the pooled money investment board to invest idle funds available for long term investment.
Title
State finances; requiring the KPERS board to liquidate the pooled money investment portfolio investment pursuant to K.S.A. 2016 Supp. 75-2263; transferring money to the state general fund and to the pooled money investment portfolio; authorizing the pooled money investment board to invest idle funds available for long term investment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 98 Nay: 25 (Y: 98 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-17 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 98 Nay: 25 |
2017-02-17 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 16, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2017-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-25 | House | House Introduced |