KS HB2160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the individual development account program act to allow certain expenditures by individuals who were likely to age out of foster care.
Title
Amending the individual development account program act to allow certain expenditures by individuals who were likely to age out of foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 125 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Children and Seniors |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 218-N |
2017-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Children and Seniors |
2017-01-25 | House | House Introduced |