KS HB2159 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute HB 2159 by Committee on Health and Human Services -- Physical therapists evaluation and treatment of patients.
Title
Substitute HB 2159 by Committee on Health and Human Services -- Physical therapists evaluation and treatment of patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 546-S | |
2012-03-07 | Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred Separately to Committee on Public Health and Welfare , Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance , Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance and Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-02-29 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-29 | Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012 | |
2012-02-23 | Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was adopted | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Landwehr | |
2012-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2012-02-09 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 784 Docking | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced |