KS HB2155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for department of health and environment response operations for water and soil pollutant release, discharge or escape.
Title
Providing for department of health and environment response operations for water and soil pollutant release, discharge or escape.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 85 Nay: 36 (Y: 85 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 85 Nay: 36 (Y: 85 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 9, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 2, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, March 12, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-18 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 85 Nay: 36 |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture |
2021-02-04 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 4, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-01-27 | House | House Introduced |