KS HB2153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 15, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas general corporation code to include public benefit corporations.
Title
Amending the Kansas general corporation code to include public benefit corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 2 (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 5 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 1 (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | House Reengrossed on Tuesday, May 9, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 2 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Wilborn, Senator Lynn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2017-04-03 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Finch , Representative Patton and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 5 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was withdrawn |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 20, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 1 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | House | House Introduced |