KS HB2147 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing bond maturity limitations in the Kansas rural housing incentive district act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing bond maturity limitations in the Kansas rural housing incentive district act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2019-02-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was adopted
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-02-05HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-05HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback