KS HB2147 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for HB 2147 by Committee on Veterans & Military-Providing an income tax refund for certain Native American veterans.
Title
Substitute for HB 2147 by Committee on Veterans & Military-Providing an income tax refund for certain Native American veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 06, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | House Reengrossed on Monday, April 2, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-20 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, February 19, 2018 |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Osterman was adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Osterman |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2018-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Veterans and Military |
2017-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Veterans and Military |
2017-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Veterans and Military; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 152-S |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 152-S |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 152-S - CANCELLED |
2017-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military |
2017-01-25 | House | House Introduced |