KS HB2145 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the possession of a firearm by certain individuals.
Title
Prohibiting the possession of a firearm by certain individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 113 Nay: 6 (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 19 Nay: 20 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 19 Nay: 20 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-02 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 20, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | House Reengrossed on Thursday, April 5, 2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 113 Nay: 6 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2018-03-20 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected Yea: 19 Nay: 20 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-02 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-02 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 1, 2018 |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finch was adopted |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finch |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Barker was adopted |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Barker |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2017-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-24 | House | House Introduced |