KS HB2144 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an offender who raises error in such offender's criminal history calculation for the first time on appeal to show prejudicial error.
Title
Requiring an offender who raises error in such offender's criminal history calculation for the first time on appeal to show prejudicial error.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 9, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-26 | House | House Introduced |