KS HB2143 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: Senate Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2143 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Amending provisions related to and providing for certain healthcare benefit coverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2143 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Amending provisions related to and providing for certain healthcare benefit coverages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-02-20SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-20HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-02-11HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 11, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-05HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-05HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback