KS HB2138 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State fire marshal; school lockdowns; rules and regulations.
Title
State fire marshal; school lockdowns; rules and regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hearing and possible action: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N - CANCELLED |
2017-01-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-24 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2138/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2138_00_0000.pdf |