KS HB2135 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an income, privilege and premium tax credit for contributions to eligible charitable organizations operating pregnancy centers or residential maternity facilities.
Title
Establishing an income, privilege and premium tax credit for contributions to eligible charitable organizations operating pregnancy centers or residential maternity facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Taxation |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-23 | House | House Introduced |