KS HB2135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Restrictions on city and county political sign regulations repealed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restrictions on city and county political sign regulations repealed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Local Government
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
2019-02-05HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-05HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback