KS HB2133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Required reporting for entities who deliver alcoholic liquors to consumers.
Title
Required reporting for entities who deliver alcoholic liquors to consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 121 Nay: 2 (Y: 121 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2019-03-13 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 121 Nay: 2 |
2019-03-13 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-02-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-02-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-02-04 | House | House Introduced |