KS HB2132 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 9, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 9, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2132 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Sale of property by port authorities
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2132 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs - Sale of property by port authorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 118 Nay: 4 (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 115 Nay: 0 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 115 Nay: 0 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | House | House Approved by Governor on Friday, June 9, 2017 |
2017-06-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, June 02, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 118 Nay: 4 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Estes, Senator Olson and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2017-05-17 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Highland and Representative Ruiz as conferees |
2017-05-17 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 37 Nay: 3 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-03 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 152-S |
2017-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military |
2017-01-23 | House | House Introduced |