KS HB2130 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 07 May 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 07 May 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; petition circulators.
Title
Elections; petition circulators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 1 (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 1 (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 07 May 2014 |
2014-05-02 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 02, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2014-05-30 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Holmes, Senator O'Donnell and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2014-03-21 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Schwab , Representative Huebert and Representative Sawyer as conferees |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 13, 2014, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 27, 2013, 9:30 AM Room 159-S |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics and Elections |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2013-02-18 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 1 |
2013-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2013-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 06, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 281-N |
2013-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2013-01-30 | House | House Introduced |