KS HB2126 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopting the Driver's Privacy Protection Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting the Driver's Privacy Protection Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 113 Nay: 10 (Y: 113 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 18, 2019
2019-05-01HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Reengrossed on Friday, April 5, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-03-27SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
2019-03-26HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Thimesch and Representative Helgerson as conferees
2019-03-21SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 113 Nay: 10
2019-02-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2019-02-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-04HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback