KS HB2125 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a copy of a will to be filed and admitted to probate and allowing a will or a copy of a will filed within six months after the death of the testator to be admitted to probate at any time.
Title
Allowing a copy of a will to be filed and admitted to probate and allowing a will or a copy of a will filed within six months after the death of the testator to be admitted to probate at any time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-19 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 18, 2021 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-18 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 3 |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 4, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-01-25 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-25 | House | House Introduced |