KS HB2123 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce, Labor and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
Pending: House Commerce, Labor and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the office of entrepreneurship within the department of commerce, encouraging that 5% of state contracts and certain incentive funding go toward Kansas businesses that have been in operation for less than five years, encouraging the elimination of first-year business fees and requiring the office of entrepreneurship to submit an annual report to the legislature.
Title
Establishing the office of entrepreneurship within the department of commerce, encouraging that 5% of state contracts and certain incentive funding go toward Kansas businesses that have been in operation for less than five years, encouraging the elimination of first-year business fees and requiring the office of entrepreneurship to submit an annual report to the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2023-02-14 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 1, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2023-01-20 | House | House Introduced |