KS HB2123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the Kansas national guard educational assistance act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the Kansas national guard educational assistance act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2019
2019-03-27HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 27, 2019
2019-03-21SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-14SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2019-02-21SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2019-02-20SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-20HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2019-02-14HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
2019-02-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
2019-02-01HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback