KS HB2122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - House Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations for FY 2020, FY 2021 and FY 2022 for various state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations for FY 2020, FY 2021 and FY 2022 for various state agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
2019-03-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
2019-01-31HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-31HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback