KS HB2121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 17, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the criminal penalty for mistreatment of a dependent adult or elder person when the victim is a resident of an adult care home, adding definitions related to defendants who abscond from supervision in the criminal procedure code and for parole and clarifying that bond agents seeking discharge as a surety are required to return the person released on bond to the court in the county where the complaint subject to the bond was filed, requiring the department of corrections to develop guidance to be used by parole officers when responding to violations of parole and postrelease supervision and that incentivize compliant behavior, and authorizing court services officers and community corrections officers to provide a certification of identification to offenders for use to obtain a new driver's license.
Title
Increasing the criminal penalty for mistreatment of a dependent adult or elder person when the victim is a resident of an adult care home, adding definitions related to defendants who abscond from supervision in the criminal procedure code and for parole and clarifying that bond agents seeking discharge as a surety are required to return the person released on bond to the court in the county where the complaint subject to the bond was filed, requiring the department of corrections to develop guidance to be used by parole officers when responding to violations of parole and postrelease supervision and that incentivize compliant behavior, and authorizing court services officers and community corrections officers to provide a certification of identification to offenders for use to obtain a new driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 101 Nay: 22 (Y: 101 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 101 Nay: 22 (Y: 101 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 7, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | House | House Reengrossed on Thursday, May 6, 2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2021-05-05 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2021-04-06 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Jennings , Representative Owens and Representative Highberger as conferees |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2021-02-12 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, February 11, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 101 Nay: 22 |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-02-08 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 1, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2021-01-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2021-01-22 | House | House Introduced |