KS HB2118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing income tax credits for aerospace and aviation program graduates and their employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing income tax credits for aerospace and aviation program graduates and their employers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 106 Nay: 18 (Y: 106 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Alcala was rejected - Yea: 32 Nay: 86 (Y: 32 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected - Yea: 45 Nay: 71 (Y: 45 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-03-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-03-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 106 Nay: 18
2019-03-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, March 26, 2019
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Alcala was rejected Yea: 32 Nay: 86
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Alcala
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was adopted
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected Yea: 45 Nay: 71
2019-03-26HouseHouse Representative Carpenter, B. raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-03-22HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-27HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
2019-02-05HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N - CANCELED
2019-01-31HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-01-31HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback