KS HB2113 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the advisory commission on Asian-American Pacific Islander affairs.
Title
Establishing the advisory commission on Asian-American Pacific Islander affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Rui Xu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2021-01-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-01-22 | House | House Introduced |