KS HB2112 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2112 by Committee on Judiciary – Amending the Kansas general corporation code and the business entity standard treatment act.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2112 by Committee on Judiciary – Amending the Kansas general corporation code and the business entity standard treatment act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 17 , 2016 |
2016-06-01 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 09, 2016 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator King, Senator Smith and Senator Haley appointed as conferees |
2016-03-21 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Macheers and Representative Carmichael as conferees |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Elections |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-03-24 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1 |
2015-03-24 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 24 , 2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 05, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112N |
2015-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 5, 2015 3:30 PM Room 112-N-CANCELLED |
2015-01-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-23 | House | House Introduced |